OCR Text |
Show 1880 TO 1912 489 The concluding year of Governor Wallace’s adminis tration had witnessed these great advances in the industrial prosperi ty of the territory. He retired from office at the expiration of his term and was succeeded by Lionel A. Sheldon. Many occurrences of importance are recorded during this eventful year, the legislative assembl y being particularly active in the consideration and passage of laws beneficial to the people of the territory.*% man during the Civil War, and was of great prominence and influence. He served in both branches of the legislative assembly and held the office of Indian Agent for the Utes and Apaches. He was a man of marked intellectual power and business capacity. Francisco A. Manzanares received his education under Fr. Antonio José Martinez, later attending school in St. Louis and New York. His business career was begun in Kansas City, where he entered the employ of the firm of Chick, Browne and Company, afterward becoming a partner in the firm. In 1871, he married Antonia Baca, a member of the noted family of that name. Politically Mr. Manzanares was always a stanch democrat. He was elected delegate from New Mexico to the 48th congress, his opponent being Tranquilin o Luna, of Valencia county. Luna was given the certificate of election but the seat was contested by Manzanares in which he was successful. He declined to accept the nomination of his party for a second term, owing to the demands of his business associates. He was a distinctive the territory, being the acknowledged leader Vegas, September 16, 1904. Miguel A. Otero was the senior member Company. He was a man and a fine appreciation of political figure in the history of of his party. He died at Las of the firm of Otero, Sellar and of distinguished attainments, strong individuality, the higher ethics of life. His was a conspicuous part in the development of the territory. He was the organizer of the firm of Otero, Sellar and Co., of which partnership the firm of Gross, Blackwell and Co. was the direct successor. He died May 30, 1882. The firm of Otero, Sellar and Company was organized in 1867. During the construction of the A., T. & S. F. Railroad the main house was located at Las Vegas, N. M. Jacob ‘Gross and Harry W. Kelly at that time became connected with the firm. A. M. Blackwell was connected with the old firm of Chick, Browne and Company. In 1881 these three organized the firm of Gross, Blackwell and Company and purchased the business of Otero, Sellar and Company. Jacob Gross was born in Baltimore, Md., but his entire business life was A. M. Blackwell was He is now a resident of St. Louis, Mo. Spent in the west. & native of Carrollton, Mo. He retired from the firm in 1901, when the firm of Gross, Kelly and Company was organized. He died suddenly at St. Louis, H. W. Kelly was born in Leavenworth, Kas., in 1858 Mo., February 14, 1912. and began his business career at the age of fifteen. In 1879 he came to Las Vegas and has ever Since been identified with its growth and development. In the business life of New Mexico he stands among the foremost. He was a member of the constitutional convention of 1910. 49° Session Laws of New Mexico, 1880: Feb. 10, 1880; county of San Juan attached to Rio Arriba county, and Tierra Amarilla made county seat. Feb. 1; general incorporation law authorizing local corporations to hold property for churches, parishes, and educational, literary, scientific, and benevolent assoClations, Genera] Incorporation Act for cities enacted. Feb. 12; act admitting foreign Corporations upon equal terms with those organized under the laws of New Mexico, Feb. 15; act to establish the bureau of immigration. The bureau was organized, April 15, with principal office at Santa Fé. |