|
|
Title | Collection Number And Name | Photo Number |
176 |
|
Interior view of the Alta Club building -- sitting area | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n623 |
177 |
|
Interior view of the Alta Club building -- sitting area | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n629 |
178 |
|
Interior view of the Alta Club building -- sitting area | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n637 |
179 |
|
Interior view of the Alta Club building -- sitting area | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n638 |
180 |
|
Interior view of the Alta Club building -- sitting area | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n641 |
181 |
|
Interior view of the Alta Club building -- sitting area | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n642 |
182 |
|
Interior view of the Alta Club building -- sitting area | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n648 |
183 |
|
Interior view of the Alta Club building -- sitting area | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n650 |
184 |
|
Interior view of the Alta Club building -- sitting area | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n651 |
185 |
|
Interior view of the Alta Club building -- sitting area | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n653 |
186 |
|
Interior view of the Alta Club building -- stained glass doors | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n617 |
187 |
|
Interior view of the Alta Club building -- stained glass doors | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n640 |
188 |
|
Interior view of the Alta Club building -- wall | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n631 |
189 |
|
Ira Rhodes, elected May 14, 1902, resigned May 9, 1917 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n537 |
190 |
|
J. C. Penny, elected December 13, 1916, resigned January 12, 1921 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n529 |
191 |
|
J. D. Stack, elected January 17, 1923 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n544 |
192 |
|
J. E. Hult, elected March 9, 1927 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n509 |
193 |
|
J. M. Davis, elected April 10, 1907, resigned August 19, 1914 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n485 |
194 |
|
J. W. "Paddy" Young | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n560 |
195 |
|
Jack T. Gilmer, elected August 11, 1909 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n497 |
196 |
|
James A. Foley, elected March 13, 1907 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n493 |
197 |
|
James Anderson, elected December 5, 1885 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n466 |
198 |
|
James E. Kearney, resigned October 14, 1937 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n513 |
199 |
|
James Glendinning, Charter Member, President 1891 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n569 |
200 |
|
James W. Neill, elected April 12, 1899 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n524 |