|
|
Title | Collection Number And Name | Photo Number |
101 |
|
Honorable William Spry, elected February 10, 1909, President December 1917, resigned December 10, 1924 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n589 |
102 |
|
Howard Fitch, elected March 13, 1912 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n492 |
103 |
|
Howard Sebree, Charter Member, died September 14, 1925 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n448 |
104 |
|
Curtis P. Mason, Charter Member | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n522 |
105 |
|
Curtis P. Mason, Charter Member, President 1889-1890 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n568 |
106 |
|
D. C. Jackling, elected May 11, 1904, President 1909 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n581 |
107 |
|
D. E. Burley, elected November 14, 1894, President 1902-1903 and 1919, died August 2, 1920 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n575 |
108 |
|
D. G. Bolton, elected July 11, 1906, resigned January 14, 1920 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n471 |
109 |
|
D. J. L. Davis, elected April 22, 1921 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n486 |
110 |
|
D. Moore Lindsay, elected July 31, 1895, resigned September 9, 1925 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n520 |
111 |
|
David C. Dunbar, elected July 30, 1900, resigned February 11, 1903 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n490 |
112 |
|
A. F. Brewer, elected February 14, 1912, resigned October 14, 1914 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n473 |
113 |
|
Abraham Hanauer, Charter Member, President 1886, died June 16, 1911 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n566 |
114 |
|
Alfred C. Rees, elected July 10, 1929, resigned August 11, 1937 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n535 |
115 |
|
Alfred Frank, elected May 8, 1907, President 1925 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n596 |
116 |
|
Arthur D. Smith, elected April 14, 1913, resigned September 10, 1919 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n543 |
117 |
|
Arthur L. Thomas, Charter Member, died Septmeber 15, 1924 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n453 |
118 |
|
August Raht, Charter Member, died December 25, 1916 [1] | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n443 |
119 |
|
B. Stewart Crow, elected September 8, 1915 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n483 |
120 |
|
Baldwin Robertson, elected August 11, 1915 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n538 |
121 |
|
Benjamin Sheeks, Charter Member, resigned July 14, 1889 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n449 |
122 |
|
Boliver Roberts, Charter Member, died August 10, 1893 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n445 |
123 |
|
Brenner X. Smith, elected July 14, 1897, President 1906, died January 6, 1920 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n578 |
124 |
|
C. B. Lakenan, elected October 13, 1909, resigned January 3, 1927 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n518 |
125 |
|
C. Bronnes | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n474 |