|
|
Title | Collection Number And Name | Photo Number |
76 |
|
In Memorium, John Dern | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n059a |
77 |
|
Charles W. de Rekowski, elected October 13, 1915, died April 16, 1929 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n060 |
78 |
|
S.V. Derrah, elected February 6, 1901, died June 4, 1915 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n061 |
79 |
|
Charles C. Dey, elected July 5, 1893, died January 18, 1936 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n062 |
80 |
|
Ed. Dickinson, elected July 2, 1898, resigned January 14, 1903 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n063 |
81 |
|
William H. Dickson, elected March 4, 1884 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n064 |
82 |
|
Ferdinand Dickert, elected February 2, 1886, resigned February 12, 1906, died February 3, 1907 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n065 |
83 |
|
H.M. Dinwoodey, elected January 23, 1899, died May 22, 1937 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n066 |
84 |
|
William T. Dinwoodey, elected March 9, 1898, died March 6, 1902 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n067 |
85 |
|
John T. Donnellan, elected December 14, 1889, resigned August 9, 1911 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n068 |
86 |
|
Colonel John W. Donnellan, elected August 6, 1889, resigned October 14, 1896, died July 26, 1917 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n069 |
87 |
|
In Memorium, Colonel John W. Donnellan | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n069a |
88 |
|
William H. Donnell, elected February 10, 1897, died October 30, 1903 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n070 |
89 |
|
Colonel George W.E. Dorsey, elected September 11, 1895, died June 12, 1911 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n071 |
90 |
|
Major George M. Downey | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n072 |
91 |
|
In Memorium, Major George M. Downey, elected 1889 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n072a |
92 |
|
Harry T. Duke, elected June 4, 1889 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n073 |
93 |
|
Frank H. Dyer, elected April 12, 1886, died March 25, 1892 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n074 |
94 |
|
S.W. Eccles, elected March 14, 1885, died December 30, 1917 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n075 |
95 |
|
Anton Eilers, elected July 30, 1900, died April 22, 1917 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n076 |
96 |
|
B.M. Ellerbeck, elected February 5, 1884, died November 16, 1901 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n077 |
97 |
|
T.R. Ellerbeck, elected March 14, 1906, died December 1, 1919 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n078 |
98 |
|
George Ellerbeck, elected August 2, 1901, died January 6, 1923 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n079 |
99 |
|
A.B. Emery, elected April 26, 1892, died June 13, 1894 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n080 |
100 |
|
S.C. Ewing, elected March 22, 1887, died December 9, 1905 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n081 |