|
|
Title | Collection Number And Name | Photo Number |
76 |
|
F. O. Horn | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n508 |
77 |
|
F. P. Gridley, elected February 9, 1898, resigned January 24, 1912 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n499 |
78 |
|
Frand. D. Kimball, elected May 8, 1907, resigned April 14, 1926 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n516 |
79 |
|
Frank B. Stephens, elected May 8, 1929 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n545 |
80 |
|
Frank Jennings, elected April 1, 1884 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n511 |
81 |
|
Frank L. Plaisted, elected March 8, 1907, resigned June 11, 1913 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n530 |
82 |
|
G. S. Holmes, elected December 23, 1889 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n506 |
83 |
|
Garrett Fort, elected July 12, 1911, resigned January 12, 1921 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n494 |
84 |
|
General Ira W. Thompson, Army Member, 1916 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n547 |
85 |
|
George E. Walker, elected February 11, 1920, resigned January 18, 1926 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n552 |
86 |
|
George H. Rathman, elected January 10, 1912 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n533 |
87 |
|
George M. Scott, Charter Member, died November 19, 1915 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n447 |
88 |
|
George O. Bradley, elected May 19, 1905, resigend July 5, 1919 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n472 |
89 |
|
George O. Relf, elected April 10, 1918, resigned January 8, 1919 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n534 |
90 |
|
George R. Horning, elected January 17, 1923, resigned December 8, 1926 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n507 |
91 |
|
George Y. Wallace, Charter Member, died September 27, 1916 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n459 |
92 |
|
H. C. Nutt, elected June 12, 1912 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n528 |
93 |
|
H. D. Randall, elected September 11, 1912, resigned May 25, 1925 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n532 |
94 |
|
H. F. Dicke, elected March 14, 1917, resigned May 25, 1925 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n488 |
95 |
|
H. H. Calvin, elected December 15, 1920, resigned March 18, 1925 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n476 |
96 |
|
H. V. Platt, elected August 9, 1916 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n531 |
97 |
|
Harry C. Hill, Charter Member, President 1885 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n565 |
98 |
|
Harry W. Baum, elected June 16, 1911, resigned November 9, 1927 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n469 |
99 |
|
Henry W. Lawrence, elected August 6, 1889, resigned August 14, 1893, died April 25, 1924. | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n519 |
100 |
|
Honorable Heber M. Wells, elected January 26, 1895 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n553 |