Title | Date | Type | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
226 | Senator Glass, Chairman Eccles, Congressman Steagall | 1937 | Image/StillImage | |
227 | Swearing-in of H. Earl Cook as Director of FDIC: Cook and Eccles | 1947-04 | Image/StillImage | |
228 | Marriner Eccles in San Francisco [02] | 1965; 1966; 1967; 1968; 1969; 1970; 1971; 1972; 1973; 1974; 1975; 1976; 1977 | Image/StillImage | |
229 | Chairman Eccles 1941 | 1941-07-23; 1941-09-29 | Image/StillImage | |
230 | Chairman Eccles, 1937, 1940 | 1937-11-15; 1940-06-13 | Image/StillImage | |
231 | Federal Reserve Board, 1934 | 1934 | Image/StillImage | |
232 | International Industrial Conference, San Francisco, 13 - 17 September 1965 | 1965-09 | Image/StillImage | |
233 | Marriner Eccles interview with Barnet Nover, 1946 | 1946-02-18 | Image/StillImage | |
234 | Confer with President on "pump priming" | 1938-04-11 | Image/StillImage | |
235 | Elder Henry James Shepherd and companion in England | 1910; 1911; 1912 | Image/StillImage | |
236 | Franklin Roosevelt [03] | 1935-08-23 | Image/StillImage | |
237 | Franklin Roosevelt [07] | 1937-10-20 | Image/StillImage | |
238 | Leo Crowley | 1940; 1941; 1942; 1943; 1944; 1945; 1946; 1947; 1948; 1949; 1950; 1951 | Image/StillImage | |
239 | Sinclair Armstrong, Waldorf, New York, June 27, 1968 [03] | 1968-06-27 | Image/StillImage | |
240 | William McChesney Martin Jr. | 1964 | Image/StillImage | |
241 | World Affairs, Man of the Year | 1973; 1974; 1975; 1976; 1977 | Image/StillImage | |
242 | Eccles in 1st Security office | 1953; 1954; 1955; 1956; 1957; 1958; 1959; 1960; 1961; 1962; 1963; 1964; 1965; 1966; 1967; 1968; 1969; 1970 | Image/StillImage | |
243 | Chairman Ecces and Walter Lippmann receive honorary degrees from the University of Utah, June 1943 | 1943-06 | Image/StillImage | |
244 | Spike (Rudolph M. Evans) | 1942; 1943; 1944; 1945; 1946; 1947; 1948; 1949; 1950; 1951; 1952; 1953; 1954 | Image/StillImage | |
245 | 1951 speech at Provo, Utah | 1951 | Image/StillImage | |
246 | Swearing-in of H. Earl Cook as Director of FDIC: Eccles, Sen. Bricker, Harl | 1947-04 | Image/StillImage | |
247 | Senate Banking & Currency Com. on Mead Bill: Chairman Eccles | 1930-06-05; 1939-07-19 | Image/StillImage | |
248 | Chairman Eccles, 1937 | 1937-01-30; 1937-02-16 | Image/StillImage | |
249 | Jesse H. Jones | 1935; 1936; 1937; 1938; 1939; 1940; 1941; 1942; 1943; 1944; 1945 | Image/StillImage | |
250 | Twenty-nine men | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910 | Image/StillImage |