|
|
Title | Date | Type | Setname |
551 |
|
The Alta "Barge," circa 1941. | 1941 | | uum_map_usa |
552 |
|
Alta at dusk, taken from the ski school porch, March 3, 1996. | 1996-03-03 | | uum_map_usa |
553 |
|
Alta gelande jumper, early 1970s. | 1970; 1971; 1972; 1973; 1974; 1975 | | uum_map_usa |
554 |
|
Alta Lodge employees. | 1965; 1966; 1967; 1968 | Image | uum_map_usa |
555 |
|
Alta Mayor George Watson. | 1940; 1941; 1942; 1943; 1944; 1945; 1946; 1947; 1948; 1949; 1950; 1951; 1952; 1953 | | uum_map_usa |
556 |
|
Alta Ski Area, circa 1950s. | 1950; 1951; 1952; 1953; 1954; 1955; 1956; 1957; 1958; 1959 | | uum_map_usa |
557 |
|
Alta torchlight parade honoring Alf Engen, December 31, 1999. | 1999-12-31 | | uum_map_usa |
558 |
|
Alta, July 3, 1885. | 1885-07-03 | | uum_map_usa |
559 |
|
Alta, Utah, circa 1944 or 1945. | 1944; 1945 | | uum_map_usa |
560 |
|
Anton Eilers, elected July 30, 1900, died April 22, 1917 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
561 |
|
Arthur Brown, elected December 22, 1888, died December 12, 1906 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
562 |
|
Arthur K. Bell, elected June 8, 1927 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image | uum_map |
563 |
|
August Raht, Charter Member, died December 25, 1916 [1] | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
564 |
|
Boliver Roberts, Charter Member, died August 10, 1893 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
565 |
|
Brenner X. Smith, elected July 14, 1897, President 1906, died January 6, 1920 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
566 |
|
Buggy transportation up canyon in 1916 | 1916 | Image | uum_map_usa |
567 |
|
C. B. Lakenan, elected October 13, 1909, resigned January 3, 1927 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919; 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image | uum_map |
568 |
|
C. E. Groesbeck, elected January 13, 1915, resigned February 13, 1918 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
569 |
|
C. F. Adams, elected August 8, 1906, resigned November 12, 1924 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919; 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image | uum_map |
570 |
|
C. Fred Jennings, elected February 8, 1911, died December 27, 1920 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
571 |
|
C.B. Jack, elected April 20, 1890, died June 4, 1914 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
572 |
|
C.W. Bennett, elected April 1, 1884 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
573 |
|
Caleb Barrett, Charter Member, died February 7, 1898 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
574 |
|
Charles Hayden, elected November 11, 1908, resigned November 13, 1918 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
575 |
|
Charles O. Whittemore, elected July 2, 1898, resigned May 13, 1908 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |