|
|
Title | Date | Type | Setname |
426 |
|
August Mathez, elected June 13, 1906, resigned December 10, 1913 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
427 |
|
August Raht, Charter Member, died December 25, 1916 [2] | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
428 |
|
B. Stewart Crow, elected September 8, 1915 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919; 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image | uum_map |
429 |
|
B.C.J. Wheatlake, elected December 9, 1925 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image | uum_map |
430 |
|
B.M. Ellerbeck, elected February 5, 1884, died November 16, 1901 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
431 |
|
Bartlet Wicks, elected January 19, 1927 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image | uum_map |
432 |
|
Benjamin Hampton, elected November 5, 1885, resigned April 21, 1888 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image | uum_map |
433 |
|
Boyd Park, Charter Member, resigned March 12, 1913 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image | uum_map |
434 |
|
C. Ira Tuttle, elected December 31, 1904, died February 10, 1916 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
435 |
|
C.C. Goodwin, Charter Member | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image | uum_map |
436 |
|
C.D. Smith, elected April 11, 1928 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image | uum_map |
437 |
|
Captain T.F. Singiser, elected October 18, 1904, died January 23, 1907 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
438 |
|
Carl Stradley, elected October 11, 1911, died February 11, 1919 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
439 |
|
Charles A. Quigley, elected January 12, 1896 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
440 |
|
Charles A. Walker, elected November 12, 1904 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
441 |
|
Charles I. Tuttle, elected January 10, 1917 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
442 |
|
Charles L. Rood, resigned December 12, 1917 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
443 |
|
Charles Popper, elected April 1, 1884, died September 25, 1909 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
444 |
|
Charles W. Morse, elected November 19, 1930 | 1930; 1931; 1932; 1933; 1934; 1935; 1936; 1937; 1938; 1939 | Image | uum_map |
445 |
|
Chester Nason, elected November 12, 1904, died April 16, 1905 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
446 |
|
Claude B. Williams, elected May 9, 1917, resigned August 10, 1918 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
447 |
|
Clayton L. Haines, Charter Member, died January 22, 1913. | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image | uum_map |
448 |
|
Curtis P. Mason, Charter Member | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image | uum_map |
449 |
|
D.C. Adams, elected June 3, 1884, died June 8, 1908 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image | uum_map |
450 |
|
D.D. Moffat, elected November 12, 1919 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image | uum_map |