|
|
Title | Date | Type | Setname |
201 |
|
Eugene Fox, elected July 11, 1928 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image | uum_map |
202 |
|
W.A. Whitney, elected October 10, 1904 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
203 |
|
Transcripts of Utah newspaper articles, 1867-1887, part 10 | 1867; 1868; 1869; 1870; 1871; 1872; 1873; 1874; 1875; 1876; 1877; 1878; 1879; 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887 | Text | uum_jhmp |
204 |
|
A letter to JH Irish dated January 20, 1865 | 1865-01-20 | Text | uaida_main |
205 |
|
B.M. Ellerbeck, elected February 5, 1884, died November 16, 1901 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
206 |
|
Charles A. Quigley, elected January 12, 1896 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
207 |
|
Charles L. Rood, resigned December 12, 1917 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
208 |
|
Duncan MacVichie, elected May 9, 1900 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
209 |
|
Ernest Stenger, elected June 12, 1907, resigned June 12, 1912 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
210 |
|
George H. Smith, elected February 9, 1910 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
211 |
|
H. C. Nutt, elected June 12, 1912 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
212 |
|
H. V. Platt, elected August 9, 1916 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
213 |
|
Ira Lewis, elected June 12, 1912 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
214 |
|
J.E. Bamberger, elected January 30, 1896, died 1928 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
215 |
|
S.V. Derrah, elected February 6, 1901, died June 4, 1915 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
216 |
|
Thomas Kearns, elected April 10, 1895, died October 18, 1918 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
217 |
|
Thomas M. Schumacher, elected September 25, 1901, resigned and re-elected November 17, 1926 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image | uum_map |
218 |
|
Virgil G. Bogue, elected August 8, 1906 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
219 |
|
W.H. Wattis, elected April 22, 1921 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image | uum_map |
220 |
|
A. F. Brewer, elected February 14, 1912, resigned October 14, 1914 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
221 |
|
A.B. Emery, elected April 26, 1892, died June 13, 1894 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
222 |
|
A.E. Welby, elected May 13, 1901, died August 8, 1909 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
223 |
|
A.W. McCune, elected December 10, 1889, resigned March 11, 1914 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
224 |
|
Allen G. Campbell, Charter Member, died June 17, 1902 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
225 |
|
The Confederated Bands of the Ute Indians USA | 1948 | Text | uaida_main |