|
|
Title | Date | Type | Setname |
976 |
|
Central Christian Church, 300 East 400 South. | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919; 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image | uum_map |
977 |
|
Central Methodist Church, Salt Lake City. | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
978 |
|
Central Pacific Railroad -- Construction P.5 | 1900 | Image/StillImage | dha_cp |
979 |
|
Central point, Mt. Trumbull | 1900 | Image | uum_map |
980 |
|
Central School | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915 | Image/StillImage | ucl_rhc |
981 |
|
Central School Children | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910 | Image/StillImage | ucl_rhc |
982 |
|
Central School Students | 1900 | Image | ucl_rhc |
983 |
|
Century Printing company staff, circa 1900 | 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902 | Image/StillImage | uum_map |
984 |
|
Ceremony or battle reenactment | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919; 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925 | Image/StillImage | dha_gmo |
985 |
|
Charles A. Walker, elected November 12, 1904 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
986 |
|
Charles B. Sears | 1900 | Image | ucl_rhc |
987 |
|
Charles Bartlett | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900 | Image/StillImage | ucl_rhc |
988 |
|
Charles Burton - manager | 1870; 1871; 1872; 1873; 1874; 1875; 1876; 1877; 1878; 1879; 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919; ... | Image | uum_map |
989 |
|
Charles C. Dey, elected July 5, 1893, died January 18, 1936 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
990 |
|
Charles Decker | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900 | Image/StillImage | ucl_rhc |
991 |
|
Charles DeMoisy | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910 | Image/StillImage | ucl_rhc |
992 |
|
Charles I. Rader | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
993 |
|
Charles O. Whittemore, elected July 2, 1898, resigned May 13, 1908 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
994 |
|
Charles R. Savage Overland Stagecoach, Salt Lake House | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908 | Image/StillImage | uum_map |
995 |
|
Charles Rich III | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900 | Image/StillImage | ucl_rhc |
996 |
|
Charles S. Burton, elected September 1, 1897, died December 29, 1923 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |
997 |
|
Charles Swasey | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910 | Image | uum_map_rr |
998 |
|
Charles Taylor Homestead | 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916 | Image/StillImage | ucl_rhc |
999 |
|
Charles W. Lyman | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
1000 |
|
Charles W. Whitley, elected August 20, 1902, died October 9, 1921 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map |