|
|
Title | Date | Type | Setname |
276 |
|
J.B. Farlow, elected December 12, 1894, died November 23, 1896 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
277 |
|
J.B. Thompson, elected December 11, 1895 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
278 |
|
J.C. O'Melveny, elected April 13, 1898, died October 11, 1899 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
279 |
|
J.D. Wood, elected December 14, 1898, died June 17, 1908 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
280 |
|
J.E. Bamberger, elected January 30, 1896, died 1928 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
281 |
|
Jacob Moritz, elected April 21, 1885, died June 8, 1910 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
282 |
|
Jacob's ladder quilt by Evaline Etta Johnson | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900 | Text | uum_uqhr |
283 |
|
James A. Miner, elected November 14, 1894, died May 27, 1907 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
284 |
|
James Anderson, elected December 5, 1885 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
285 |
|
James E. Jennings, elected February 12, 1896 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
286 |
|
James Glendinning, Charter Member, President 1891 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
287 |
|
James K. Gillispie, elected April 10, 1888, resigned February 9, 1898 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
288 |
|
Jas. T. Clasbey, elected March 14, 1885 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
289 |
|
Jerry C. Conklin, Charter Member, resigned February 7, 1895 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
290 |
|
Jessie E. Johnson (Mrs. Frank Miller). | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | | uum_map |
291 |
|
Jitney on lower Dugway | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map_usa |
292 |
|
Jitney opposite Hogum Fork | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image | uum_map_usa |
293 |
|
John Christopher Cutler, 1846-1928 [1] | 1860; 1861; 1862; 1863; 1864; 1865; 1866; 1867; 1868; 1869; 1870; 1871; 1872; 1873; 1874; 1875; 1876; 1877; 1878; 1879; 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; ... | Image | uum_hu |
294 |
|
John Christopher Cutler, 1846-1928 [2] | 1860; 1861; 1862; 1863; 1864; 1865; 1866; 1867; 1868; 1869; 1870; 1871; 1872; 1873; 1874; 1875; 1876; 1877; 1878; 1879; 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; ... | Image | uum_hu |
295 |
|
John Christopher Cutler, 1846-1928 [3] | 1860; 1861; 1862; 1863; 1864; 1865; 1866; 1867; 1868; 1869; 1870; 1871; 1872; 1873; 1874; 1875; 1876; 1877; 1878; 1879; 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; ... | Image | uum_hu |
296 |
|
John Christopher Cutler, 1846-1928 [4] | 1860; 1861; 1862; 1863; 1864; 1865; 1866; 1867; 1868; 1869; 1870; 1871; 1872; 1873; 1874; 1875; 1876; 1877; 1878; 1879; 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; ... | Image | uum_hu |
297 |
|
John J. Daly, elected December 2, 1884, President 1898-1899 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
298 |
|
John L. Kimball, elected December 22, 1889 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
299 |
|
John M. Zane, elected March 14, 1885 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
300 |
|
John McVicker, Charter Member, resigned September 6, 1887, died September 27, 1907 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |