|
|
Title | Collection Number And Name | Photo Number |
1 |
|
Pope Yeatman, elected April 10, 1907, resigned January 10, 1917 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n558 |
2 |
|
Portrait of Arnold O. Larson, manager of the Alta Club in Salt Lake City, Utah | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n612 |
3 |
|
Portrait of George S. Erb, Charter Member | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n607 |
4 |
|
Portrait of I. A. Clayton, Jr., elected December 14, 1927 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n604 |
5 |
|
Portrait of I. A. Clayton, Jr., elected December 14, 1927 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n605 |
6 |
|
Portrait of J. A. Cunningham, elected April 13, 1898, died March 24, 1919 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n601 |
7 |
|
Portrait of unidentified Alta Club member | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n600 |
8 |
|
Portrait of unidentified Alta Club member | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n602 |
9 |
|
Portrait of unidentified Alta Club member | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n603 |
10 |
|
Portrait of W. L. (Wally) Stewart, manager of the Alta Club in Salt Lake City, Utah | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n611 |
11 |
|
R. T. Badger, elected December 10, 1902, President 1915, resigned April 9, 1919 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n587 |
12 |
|
R. W. Salisbery, elected September 11, 1907, President 1913, resigned March 18, 1925 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n541 |
13 |
|
R. W. Salisbury, elected September 11, 1907, President 1913, resigned March 18, 1925 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n585 |
14 |
|
Richard Mackintosh, Charter Member, President 1892-1895, died February 14, 1900 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n570 |
15 |
|
Robert Campbell Gemmell, elected March 14, 1906, President 1914, died October 25, 1922 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n586 |
16 |
|
Royal W. Daynes, elected December 11, 1928 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n487 |
17 |
|
Samuel Newhouse, elected June 18, 1898, resigned December 15, 1920 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n525 |
18 |
|
Samuel S. Walker, Charter Member, died September 10, 1887 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n457 |
19 |
|
Scott W. Crismon, elected September 13, 1899 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n482 |
20 |
|
Simon Guggenheim | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n501 |
21 |
|
Stephen H. Babcock | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n468 |
22 |
|
Thomas Blythe, elected June 14, 1905, resigned May 5, 1923 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n479 |
23 |
|
Thomas J. O'Brien, elected March 8, 1916, President 1928 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n598 |
24 |
|
Thomas R. Stockett, elected January 17, 1923, died 1943 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n546 |
25 |
|
Thomas Wier, elected April 10, 1901, resigned November 12, 1919 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n555 |