|
|
Title | Collection Number And Name | Photo Number |
1 |
|
Warren C. Bogue, elected February 8, 1899 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n025 |
2 |
|
Pope Yeatman, elected April 10, 1907, resigned January 10, 1917 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n558 |
3 |
|
Portrait of Arnold O. Larson, manager of the Alta Club in Salt Lake City, Utah | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n612 |
4 |
|
Portrait of George S. Erb, Charter Member | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n607 |
5 |
|
Portrait of I. A. Clayton, Jr., elected December 14, 1927 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n604 |
6 |
|
Portrait of I. A. Clayton, Jr., elected December 14, 1927 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n605 |
7 |
|
Portrait of J. A. Cunningham, elected April 13, 1898, died March 24, 1919 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n601 |
8 |
|
Portrait of unidentified Alta Club member | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n600 |
9 |
|
Portrait of unidentified Alta Club member | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n602 |
10 |
|
Portrait of unidentified Alta Club member | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n603 |
11 |
|
Portrait of W. L. (Wally) Stewart, manager of the Alta Club in Salt Lake City, Utah | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n611 |
12 |
|
R. T. Badger, elected December 10, 1902, President 1915, resigned April 9, 1919 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n587 |
13 |
|
R. W. Salisbery, elected September 11, 1907, President 1913, resigned March 18, 1925 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n541 |
14 |
|
R. W. Salisbury, elected September 11, 1907, President 1913, resigned March 18, 1925 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n585 |
15 |
|
R.G. Schulder, elected April 12, 1911 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n210 |
16 |
|
R.H. Channing, elected August 9, 1899 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n283 |
17 |
|
R.N. Hunt, elected December 14, 1927 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n302 |
18 |
|
R.S. Allison, elected April 22, 1921 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n264 |
19 |
|
R.W. Sloan, elected January 13, 1909 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n216 |
20 |
|
Richard Keyes, elected December 10, 1889, died August 23, 1918 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n135 |
21 |
|
Richard Mackintosh, Charter Member, died February 14, 1900 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n431 |
22 |
|
Richard Mackintosh, Charter Member, President 1892-1895, died February 14, 1900 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n570 |
23 |
|
Richard W. Madsen, elected June 11, 1924 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n327 |
24 |
|
Richard W. Senger, elected June 8, 1927 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n354 |
25 |
|
Richard W. Young, elected December 12, 1894, died December 22, 1919 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n259 |