|
|
Title | Collection Number And Name | Photo Number |
1 |
|
Alta Club exterior | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | P0254n11_04_654 |
2 |
|
In Memorium, Judge Ogden Hiles | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n111a |
3 |
|
Richard Mackintosh, Charter Member, died February 14, 1900 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n431 |
4 |
|
Richard Mackintosh, Charter Member, President 1892-1895, died February 14, 1900 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n570 |
5 |
|
Robert C. Chamber, Charter Member, died April 11, 1901 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n397 |
6 |
|
Robert N. Baskin, Charter Member, resigned May 14, 1895 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n393 |
7 |
|
Samuel A. Merritt, Charter Member, died September 8, 1910 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n434 |
8 |
|
Samuel S. Walker, Charter Member, died September 10, 1887 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n457 |
9 |
|
Stephen H. Babcock | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n468 |
10 |
|
Thomas E. Clohecy, Charter Member | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n398 |
11 |
|
Thomas Marshall, Charter Member, died September 13, 1906 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n433 |
12 |
|
Thomas R. Jones, Charter Member, died May 7, 1914 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n425 |
13 |
|
W. S. McCornick, Charter Member, President 1883 and 1911, died May 8, 1921 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n563 |
14 |
|
W.L. Pickard, elected January 11, 1885, resigned May 10, 1893 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n189 |
15 |
|
Dr. Allen Fowler, Charter Member, died May 6, 1902 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n406 |
16 |
|
Dr. John F. Hamilton, Charter Member, died April 13, 1892 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n418 |
17 |
|
E.A. Ireland, Charter Member, died 1898 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n424 |
18 |
|
Edward P. Ferry, Charter Member, resigned November 11, 1896 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n405 |
19 |
|
Edwin Kimball, elected June 5, 1885, died October 12, 1893 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n138 |
20 |
|
Eli H. Murray, honorary member | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n170 |
21 |
|
Enos D. Hoge, Charter Member, resigned January 5, 1886 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n422 |
22 |
|
Ezra J. Travis, Charter Member, resigned February 8, 1905 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n455 |
23 |
|
Frank Foote, Charter Member, resigned November 6, 1888 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n407 |
24 |
|
Frank G. Brown, Charter Member | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n395 |
25 |
|
Frank H. Dyer, elected April 12, 1886, died March 25, 1892 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n074 |