|
|
Title | Date | Type |
476 |
|
John W. Young, elected September 28, 1894, died January 14, 1912 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
477 |
|
John Weir, Jr., elected October 9, 1901 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
478 |
|
Joseph B. Toronto, elected December 11, 1901, resigned March 12, 1913 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
479 |
|
Joseph B. Walden, elected April 10, 1888, resigned June 5, 1893 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image |
480 |
|
Joseph D. Evans, elected March 12, 1913, resigned January 9, 1918 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
481 |
|
Joseph E. Caine, elected May 8, 1907, resigned February 12, 1908 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
482 |
|
Joseph E. Galigher, elected June 25, 1885, President 1896-1897 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image |
483 |
|
Joseph E. Galigher, elected June 25, 1885, President 1896-1897, died August 11, 1931 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
484 |
|
Joseph Geogegan, elected November 22, 1889, died January 27, 1916 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
485 |
|
Joseph H. Patrick, elected August 8, 1923, resigned September 9, 1925 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image |
486 |
|
Joseph H. Young, elected November 14, 1894, resigned August 14, 1918 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
487 |
|
Joseph M. Bidwell, elected April 22, 1904 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
488 |
|
Joseph R. Sharp, elected December 5, 1885 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image |
489 |
|
Joseph R. Walker, Charter Member, died January 6, 1901 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image |
490 |
|
Josiah Barnett, Charter Member, died November 30, 1920 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image |
491 |
|
Josiah Barnett, Charter Member, President 1900, died November 30, 1920 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image |
492 |
|
Joy H. Johnson, elected July 12, 1911 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
493 |
|
Judge W.D. Cornish, elected April 12, 1899, died November 7, 1908 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
494 |
|
Jules D. Roberts, elected April 10, 1929 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image |
495 |
|
Jules Labarthe, elected August 10, 1910, resigned November 10, 1918 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
496 |
|
Justus Jungk, elected May 14, 1902, resigned November 14, 1917 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
497 |
|
Karl Scheid, elected May 13, 1908 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
498 |
|
L. Ross Weber, elected January 14, 1931 | 1930; 1931; 1932; 1933; 1934; 1935; 1936; 1937; 1938; 1939 | Image |
499 |
|
L.B. McCornick, elected September 25, 1906 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
500 |
|
L.H. Farnsworth, elected November 8, 1916 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919; 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image |