|
|
Title | Collection Number And Name | Photo Number |
276 |
|
In Memorium, Charles Tyng | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n231a |
277 |
|
E.J. Ullrich, elected May 11, 1904, died June 28, 1926 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n232 |
278 |
|
Joseph B. Walden, elected April 10, 1888, resigned June 5, 1893 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n233 |
279 |
|
Enos A. Wall, elected March 14, 1884, President 1905, died June 29, 1920 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n234 |
280 |
|
W.H. Wattis, elected April 22, 1921 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n235 |
281 |
|
In Memorium, Thomas G. Webber | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n236a |
282 |
|
J.C. Weeter, elected January 10, 1907 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n237 |
283 |
|
John Weir, Jr., elected October 9, 1901 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n238 |
284 |
|
Samuel Austin Whitney, elected March 26, 1906, died January 19, 1920 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n239 |
285 |
|
In Memorium, Samuel Austin Whitney | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n239a |
286 |
|
Charles W. Whitley, elected August 20, 1902, died October 9, 1921 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n240 |
287 |
|
In Memorium, Charles Walter Whitley | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n240a |
288 |
|
W.A. Whitney, elected October 10, 1904 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n241 |
289 |
|
Charles O. Whittemore, elected July 2, 1898, resigned May 13, 1908 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n242 |
290 |
|
In Memorium, C.O. Whittemore | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n242a |
291 |
|
A.E. Welby, elected May 13, 1901, died August 8, 1909 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n243 |
292 |
|
Honorable Caleb West, Honorary Member | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n244 |
293 |
|
Frank J. Wescott, elected June 28, 1902 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n245 |
294 |
|
Edward B. Wicks, elected May 13, 1889, died July 29, 1926 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n246 |
295 |
|
In Memorium, Edward Bartlett Wicks | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n246a |
296 |
|
H.G. Williams, elected April 9, 1902, resigned August 11, 1911 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n247 |
297 |
|
A.L. Williams, elected December 29, 1889, resigned May 11, 1892 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n248 |
298 |
|
Thomas K. Williams, elected February 18, 1890, died April 10, 1896 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n249 |
299 |
|
Fred T. Williams, elected June 14, 1916, died January 14, 1917 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n250 |
300 |
|
Claude B. Williams, elected May 9, 1917, resigned August 10, 1918 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n251 |