|
|
Title | Date | Type |
126 |
|
Lester D. Freed, elected April 11, 1906 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
127 |
|
Lewis A. Scott-Elliott | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
128 |
|
Lindsay R. Rogers, elected February 8, 1898 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
129 |
|
M.A. Hughes, elected January 9, 1895, resigned August 20, 1902 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
130 |
|
M.B. Sowles, elected December 23, 1889, died March 11, 1916 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
131 |
|
Major George M. Downey | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
132 |
|
Mark L. Requa, elected February 14, 1906, resigned September 13, 1911 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
133 |
|
Max E. Smith, elected October 9, 1901, resigned December 12, 1906 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
134 |
|
O.E. Cary, elected December 31, 1904, died August 20, 1917 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
135 |
|
Orange J. Salisbury, elected November 13, 1907, President 1916 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
136 |
|
P. L. Williams, Charter Member, President 1912 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
137 |
|
P.A.H. Franklin | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1941 | Image |
138 |
|
P.J. Quealey, elected January 10, 1900 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
139 |
|
P.L. Kimberly, elected August 21, 1901, died June 4, 1905 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
140 |
|
Portrait of J. A. Cunningham, elected April 13, 1898, died March 24, 1919 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
141 |
|
R. T. Badger, elected December 10, 1902, President 1915, resigned April 9, 1919 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
142 |
|
R. W. Salisbury, elected September 11, 1907, President 1913, resigned March 18, 1925 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
143 |
|
R.H. Channing, elected August 9, 1899 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
144 |
|
Richard Keyes, elected December 10, 1889, died August 23, 1918 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
145 |
|
Richard W. Young, elected December 12, 1894, died December 22, 1919 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
146 |
|
Robert B. Harkness, elected February 12, 1901 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
147 |
|
Robert Campbell Gemmell, elected March 14, 1906, President 1914, died October 25, 1922 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
148 |
|
S.C. Ewing, elected March 22, 1887, died December 9, 1905 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
149 |
|
S.V. Derrah, elected February 6, 1901, died June 4, 1915 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
150 |
|
S.W. Eccles, elected March 14, 1885, died December 30, 1917 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |