|
|
Title | Date | Type |
451 |
|
Jackson McChrystal, elected January 12, 1916, resigned June 11, 1919, died 1928 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
452 |
|
Jacob Moritz, elected April 21, 1885, died June 8, 1910 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
453 |
|
James A. Foley, elected March 13, 1907 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
454 |
|
James A. Hogle, elected May 11, 1908 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
455 |
|
James A. Miner, elected November 14, 1894, died May 27, 1907 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
456 |
|
James Anderson, elected December 5, 1885 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image |
457 |
|
James B. Whitehill, elected April 14, 1920 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image |
458 |
|
James E. Clinton, elected August 10, 1904, died August 15, 1911 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
459 |
|
James E. Jennings, elected February 12, 1896 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
460 |
|
James E. Kearney, resigned October 14, 1937 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929; 1930; 1931; 1932; 1933; 1934; 1935; 1936; 1937; 1938; 1939 | Image |
461 |
|
James Glendinning, Charter Member, President 1891 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image |
462 |
|
James Glendinning, Charter Member, resigned 1898 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image |
463 |
|
James J. Burke, elected October 8, 1913 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
464 |
|
James K. Gillispie, elected April 10, 1888, resigned February 9, 1898 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image |
465 |
|
James Lowe, elected January 11, 1885, died October 20, 1893 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image |
466 |
|
James T. Little, Charter Member, died February 28, 1898 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image |
467 |
|
James W. Collins, elected May 12, 1920 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image |
468 |
|
James W. Neill, elected April 12, 1899 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
469 |
|
James W. Wade, elected February 16, 1927 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image |
470 |
|
Jas. B. Smith, elected October 10, 1923 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image |
471 |
|
Jas. H. Paterson, elected December 13, 1905, died October 16, 1916 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
472 |
|
Jas. T. Clasbey, elected March 14, 1885 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image |
473 |
|
Jerry C. Conklin, Charter Member, resigned February 7, 1895 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image |
474 |
|
Joab Lawrence, Charter Member, died December 28, 1888 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image |
475 |
|
Joab Lawrence, Charter Member, President 1884, died December 28, 1888 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image |