|
|
Title | Date | Type | Setname |
876 |
|
Four adults, two children including little girl with doll, and an infant pose [2] | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910 | | uum_map |
877 |
|
Four children, 19th century? | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910 | | uum_map |
878 |
|
Four girls seated on one horse in front of a house. | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image | uum_map |
879 |
|
Four Indigenous boys | 1860; 1861; 1862; 1863; 1864; 1865; 1866; 1867; 1868; 1869; 1870; 1871; 1872; 1873; 1874; 1875; 1876; 1877; 1878; 1879; 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890 | | uum_map |
880 |
|
Four Leaf Clover Variation quilt, by Millissa Campbell Berrett | 1855; 1856; 1857; 1858; 1859; 1860; 1861; 1862; 1863; 1864; 1865; 1866; 1867; 1868; 1869; 1870; 1871; 1872; 1873; 1874; 1875; 1876; 1877; 1878; 1879; 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1900 | Text | uum_uqhr |
881 |
|
Four of J. E. Johnson's daughters: Rosemary (Eliza), Emily Maude (Eliza), Mary Julia (Harriet), Blanche Alpine (Harriet) [note: the name in parentheses indicates which one of Johnson's wives was the mother]. | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | | uum_map |
882 |
|
Frances R. Burke, who ran the Presbyterian Mission School in Tocquerville, Utah, circa 1885 | 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888 | Image/StillImage | uum_map |
883 |
|
Francis and Will Just | 1870; 1871; 1872; 1873; 1874; 1875; 1876; 1877; 1878; 1879; 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
884 |
|
Francis Armstrong [01] | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image/StillImage | uum_map |
885 |
|
Francis Armstrong and colleagues | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image/StillImage | uum_map |
886 |
|
Frank Foote, Charter Member, resigned November 6, 1888 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image | uum_map |
887 |
|
Frank G. Brown, Charter Member | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
888 |
|
Frank H. Dyer, elected April 12, 1886, died March 25, 1892 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image | uum_map |
889 |
|
Frank Hat | 1860; 1861; 1862; 1863; 1864; 1865; 1866; 1867; 1868; 1869; 1870; 1871; 1872; 1873; 1874; 1875; 1876; 1877; 1878; 1879; 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890 | Image | uum_map |
890 |
|
Frank Jennings, elected April 1, 1884 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image | uum_map |
891 |
|
Frank Steward, recognized master "doping" (waxing) expert in the late 1800s. | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | | uum_map_usa |
892 |
|
Fred C. Gentsch, Charter Member, died April 21, 1888 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image | uum_map |
893 |
|
Fred H. Auerbach, Charter Member, died September 5, 1896 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image | uum_map |
894 |
|
Fred H. Auerbach, Sr. | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900 | Image/StillImage | uum_map |
895 |
|
Fred R. McConnell, Charter Member, resigned January 5, 1886 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image | uum_map |
896 |
|
Fred Simon | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900 | Image/StillImage | uum_map |
897 |
|
Freda Barnson | 1875; 1876; 1877; 1878; 1879; 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890 | Image/StillImage | uum_map |
898 |
|
Frederick Albert Hale and wife | 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887 | Image/StillImage | uum_map |
899 |
|
Frederick Albert Hale in a group of people in costume | 1878; 1879; 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885 | Image/StillImage | uum_map |
900 |
|
Frederick G. Burton Presbyterian Church in Utah research collection, 1871-2006 (bulk 1871-1951) | 1871; 1872; 1873; 1874; 1875; 1876; 1877; 1878; 1879; 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919; 1920; ... | | wc_ead |