|
|
Title | Collection Number And Name | Photo Number |
76 |
|
Robert McElveny, elected March 14, 1928 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n325 |
77 |
|
William H. McIntyre, Jr., elected July 14, 1920 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n326 |
78 |
|
Richard W. Madsen, elected June 11, 1924 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n327 |
79 |
|
Gibson A. Marr, elected March 8, 1922 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n328 |
80 |
|
Allen H. Means, elected February 8, 1928 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n329 |
81 |
|
D.D. Moffat, elected November 12, 1919 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n331 |
82 |
|
Rt. Rev. A.W. Moulton, elected June 9, 1920 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n332 |
83 |
|
Thos. J. O'Brien, elected March 8, 1916, President 1928. | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n334 |
84 |
|
Rudolph Orlob, elected October 9, 1929 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n336 |
85 |
|
C.C. Parsons, elected July 9, 1919 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n339 |
86 |
|
C.T.S. Parsons, elected July 9, 1919 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n340 |
87 |
|
Cliford R. Pearsall, elected July 12, 1899, President 1922-1924 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n341 |
88 |
|
Dr. W.M. Pugh, elected May 11, 1927 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n343 |
89 |
|
Phil. J. Purcell, elected May 25, 1925 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n344 |
90 |
|
Gill G. Richards, elected September 9, 1925 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n346 |
91 |
|
L.J. Riter, elected June 8, 1927 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n347 |
92 |
|
Jules D. Roberts, elected April 10, 1929 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n348 |
93 |
|
W. Bert Robinson, elected October 10, 1920 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n349 |
94 |
|
Thomas M. Schumacher, elected September 25, 1901, resigned and re-elected November 17, 1926 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n352 |
95 |
|
E.H. Selbach, elected February 21, 1923 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n353 |
96 |
|
Richard W. Senger, elected June 8, 1927 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n354 |
97 |
|
Earl V. Smith, elected March 10, 1920 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n356 |
98 |
|
Jas. B. Smith, elected October 10, 1923 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n359 |
99 |
|
A.P. Spitko, elected June 8, 1927 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n362 |
100 |
|
Harold Stephens, elected February 16, 1927 | P0254 Alta Club Photograph Collection | p0254n364 |