|
|
Title | Date | Type |
101 |
|
Colonel Irons, Army Member | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919; 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image |
102 |
|
Colonel John W. Donnellan, elected August 6, 1889, resigned October 14, 1896, died July 26, 1917 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image |
103 |
|
Colonel Nephi W. Clayton, elected August 13, 1897, died January 9, 1918 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
104 |
|
Curtis P. Mason, Charter Member | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image |
105 |
|
Curtis P. Mason, Charter Member, President 1889-1890 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889; 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image |
106 |
|
D. C. Jackling, elected May 11, 1904, President 1909 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
107 |
|
D. E. Burley, elected November 14, 1894, President 1902-1903 and 1919, died August 2, 1920 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
108 |
|
D. G. Bolton, elected July 11, 1906, resigned January 14, 1920 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
109 |
|
D. J. L. Davis, elected April 22, 1921 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image |
110 |
|
D. Moore Lindsay, elected July 31, 1895, resigned September 9, 1925 | 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919; 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image |
111 |
|
D.C. Adams, elected June 3, 1884, died June 8, 1908 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image |
112 |
|
D.C. Jackling, elected May 11, 1904 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
113 |
|
D.D. Moffat, elected November 12, 1919 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image |
114 |
|
D.D. Muir, Jr., elected February 8, 1922, died October 23, 1937 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image |
115 |
|
D.H. Peery, elected April 13, 1898, died December 6, 1907 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907 | Image |
116 |
|
David C. Dunbar, elected July 30, 1900, resigned February 11, 1903 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
117 |
|
David E. Burley, elected November 14, 1894, President, 1902, 1903, 1919, died August 2, 1920 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899; 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
118 |
|
David Keith, elected April 26, 1892, died April 16, 1918 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
119 |
|
David Keith, elected June 11, 1919 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image |
120 |
|
David R. Gray, elected September 25, 1905, died May 5, 1923 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909; 1910; 1911; 1912; 1913; 1914; 1915; 1916; 1917; 1918; 1919 | Image |
121 |
|
Dr. A.L. Castleman, elected April 11, 1906 | 1900; 1901; 1902; 1903; 1904; 1905; 1906; 1907; 1908; 1909 | Image |
122 |
|
Dr. Allen Fowler, Charter Member, died May 6, 1902 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image |
123 |
|
Dr. Jack T. Keith, elected March 10, 1920, resigned October 15, 1924 | 1920; 1921; 1922; 1923; 1924; 1925; 1926; 1927; 1928; 1929 | Image |
124 |
|
Dr. John F. Hamilton, Charter Member, died April 13, 1892 | 1880; 1881; 1882; 1883; 1884; 1885; 1886; 1887; 1888; 1889 | Image |
125 |
|
Dr. Samuel H. Pinkerton, elected July 13, 1892 | 1890; 1891; 1892; 1893; 1894; 1895; 1896; 1897; 1898; 1899 | Image |